VA SJR46 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ46ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ46ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Chest Wall Deformity Awareness Month. Designates December, in 2024 and in each succeeding year, as Chest Wall Deformity Awareness Month in Virginia.
Title
Chest Wall Deformity Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ46ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Taken up |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24105196D |