VA SJR44 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ44ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ44ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Oscar F. Smith High School football team.
Title
Commending the Oscar F. Smith High School football team.
Sponsors
Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] |
Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ44ER) |
2022-01-24 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-01-21 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2022-01-21 | House | Received |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Presented 22103454D |