VA SJR395 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR395
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 150th anniversary of the enactment of the Civil Rights Act of 1871. Commemorates the 150th anniversary of the enactment of the Civil Rights Act of 1871. This resolution is a recommendation of the Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Commission.
Title
Commemorating the 150th anniversary of the enactment of the Civil Rights Act of 1871.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Presented 21102447D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR395 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SJ395 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SJ395+hil |