VA SJR382 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ382ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Chancellor High School field hockey team.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Chancellor High School field hockey team.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ382ER)
2019-02-19HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2019-02-15HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2019-02-15HouseReceived
2019-02-14SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate
2019-02-11SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2019-02-11SenatePresented 19106304D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback