VA SJR381 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ381ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ381ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Gabrielle Christina Victoria Douglas.
Title
Commending Gabrielle Christina Victoria Douglas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ381ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-02-10 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2017-02-10 | House | Received |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Presented 17100436D |