VA SJR38 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ38ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ38ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the assassination of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. The resolution is a recommendation of the Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Commission. The resolution is identical to HJ 31.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the assassination of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ38ER) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Taken up |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104662D |