VA SJR363 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Agreed to by House by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Agreed to by House by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Steven R. Cover.
Title
Commending Steven R. Cover.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. Jennifer Kiggans [R] |
Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] | Sen. Ryan McDougle [R] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2021-02-05 | House | Received |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Presented 21104035D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SJ363 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SJ363+hil |