VA SJR362 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ362ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the James Madison High School softball team.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the James Madison High School softball team.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ362ER)
2019-02-23HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2019-02-15HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2019-02-15HouseReceived
2019-02-14SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate
2019-02-06SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2019-02-06SenatePresented 19106033D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback