VA SJR355 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Agreed to by House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Joseph Brisco Dellinger.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Joseph Brisco Dellinger.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseAgreed to by House
2021-02-05HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2021-02-05HouseReceived
2021-02-04SenateAgreed to by Senate
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate
2021-02-02SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2021-02-02SenatePresented 21103849D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback