VA SJR353 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ353ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Elnora S. Branch.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Elnora S. Branch.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-10SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ353ER)
2017-02-10HouseAgreed to by House
2017-02-03HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2017-02-03HouseReceived
2017-02-02SenateAgreed to by Senate
2017-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate
2017-01-31SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2017-01-31SenatePresented 17104021D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback