VA SJR353 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ353ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ353ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Outstanding Virginian celebration. Authorizes a change of venue for the Outstanding Virginian celebration.
Title
Outstanding Virginian Day; General Assembly to authorize change of venue for celebration.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ353ER) |
2013-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Taken up |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ353S1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104507D-S1 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104507D-S1 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103857D |