VA SJR351 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ351ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending LINK, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending LINK, Inc.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ351ER)
2023-02-20HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2023-02-17HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2023-02-17HouseReceived
2023-02-16SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2023-02-16SenateEngrossed by Senate
2023-02-15SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2023-02-15SenatePresented 23100714D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback