VA SJR35 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Study; barrier crimes and criminal history records checks; report. Establishes a joint subcommittee to study the Commonwealth's requirements related to barrier crimes and criminal history records checks. The resolution directs the joint subcommittee to, in conducting its study, develop recommendations related to (i) whether statutory provisions related to criminal history records checks, barrier crimes, and barrier crime exceptions should be reorganized and consolidated into a central location in the Code of Virginia; (ii) whether certain crimes should be removed from the list of barrier crimes; (iii) whether barrier crime exceptions and waiver processes should be broadened; (iv) whether the required amount of time that must lapse after conviction of certain barrier crimes should be shortened; and (v) other changes that could be made to criminal history records check and barrier crimes requirements that would improve the organization, effectiveness, and fairness of such provisions.
Title
Barrier crimes and criminal history records checks; joint subcommittee to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (72-Y 17-N) (Y: 72 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 20-N) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 2-N) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 20-N) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 2-N) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (72-Y 17-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (72-Y 17-N) |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 20109990D-S1 |
2020-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Herring, Scott, Kilgore |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Edwards, Deeds, Vogel |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request by voice vote |
2020-03-05 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 20-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Agreed to by House with amendments (76-Y 20-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-03 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102494D |