VA SJR345 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Agreed to by House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Agreed to by House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Sigmund Edward Davidson.
Title
Celebrating the life of Sigmund Edward Davidson.
Sponsors
Sen. John Edwards [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. William Stanley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Agreed to by House |
2021-02-05 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2021-02-05 | House | Received |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Presented 21102645D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SJ345 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SJ345+hil |