VA SJR339 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ339ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ339ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending John Henry Middleton, Jr.
Title
Commending John Henry Middleton, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ339ER) |
2015-02-20 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-02-13 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2015-02-13 | House | Received |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Presented 15104599D |