VA SJR332 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ332ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ332ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments; January 22. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor Ralph Northam and communicated to the General Assembly January 22, 2019.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ332ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Taken up |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19105648D |