VA SJR327 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ327ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ327ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Dr. Debra Saunders-White.
Title
Celebrating the life of Dr. Debra Saunders-White.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ327ER) |
2017-02-03 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-01-27 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2017-01-27 | House | Received |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented 17102599D |