VA SJR326 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ326ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ326ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of David Anthony Rice.
Title
Celebrating the life of David Anthony Rice.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. William Stanley [R] | Sen. Emmett Hanger [R] | Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ326ER) |
2021-02-01 | House | Agreed to by House |
2021-01-29 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2021-01-29 | House | Received |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Presented 21102552D |