VA SJR323 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR323
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Liberty Amendments Month.
Title
Liberty Amendments Month; designating June 19 through third Monday in July, in 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21103601D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR323 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote