VA SJR317 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ317ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ317ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments; February 1. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor Glenn Youngkin and communicated to the General Assembly February 1, 2023.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption lines 46-49 (Robert (89-Y 1-N) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption except lines 46-49 (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption except lines 46-49 (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ317ER) |
2023-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption lines 46-49 (Robert (89-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed House, lines 46-49 (89-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption except lines 46-49 (93-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed House, (except lines 46-49) (93-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Taken up |
2023-02-22 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23106461D |