VA SJR315 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ315ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ315ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Center for Alexandria%92s Children.
Title
Commending the Center for Alexandria?s Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ315ER) |
2017-02-10 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-02-03 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2017-02-03 | House | Received |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Presented 17101433D |