VA SJR314 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ314ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ314ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Chapter of American Promise and Take Back Our Republic.
Title
Commending the Virginia Chapter of American Promise and Take Back Our Republic.
Sponsors
Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ314ER) |
2021-01-25 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2021-01-22 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2021-01-22 | House | Received |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Presented 21102575D |