VA SJR306 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); apportionment; Virginia Redistricting Commission. Establishes the Virginia Redistricting Commission, a 16-member Commission tasked with establishing districts for the United States House of Representatives and for the Senate and the House of Delegates of the General Assembly. The Commission consists of eight legislative members and eight citizen members. The legislative members consist of four members of the Senate of Virginia and four members of the House of Delegates, with equal representation given to the political parties having the highest and next highest number of members in their respective houses. The citizen members are selected by a selection committee consisting of five retired judges of the circuit courts of Virginia, from lists submitted to the selection committee by the Speaker of the House of Delegates, the leader in the House of Delegates of the political party having the next highest number of members in the House of Delegates, the President pro tempore of the Senate of Virginia, and the leader in the Senate of the political party having the next highest number of members in the Senate. The Commission is required to submit to the General Assembly plans of districts for the Senate and the House of Delegates of the General Assembly no later than 45 days following the receipt of census data and plans of districts for the United States House of Representatives no later than 60 days following the receipt of census data, or July 1 of that year, whichever occurs later. The measure requires certain vote thresholds for plans, depending on the type of district, in order to be submitted to the General Assembly. No amendments may be made to a plan by the General Assembly or the Governor. The measure requires additional plans to be submitted, or additional time to be given to submit a plan, in certain circumstances, and further provides that districts will be drawn by the Supreme Court of Virginia if such efforts fail.
Title
Constitutional amendment; Virginia Redistricting Commission (first reference).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #3 by Senator Sturtevant rejected (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #3 by Senator Sturtevant rejected (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824) | |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned Chapter 824 (effective 7/1/19) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ306ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (85-Y 13-N) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 19107724D-S2 |
2019-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Cole, Rush, Leftwich, Krizek |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Vogel, Cosgrove |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Agreed to by House with substitute (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ306 |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106689D-H1 (51-Y 48-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Taken up |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106689D-H1 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19105499D-ES1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SJ306ES1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #3 by Senator Sturtevant rejected (17-Y 23-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Amendments #1 and #2 by Senator Sturtevant withdrawn |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Howell agreed to |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105499D-S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105499D-S1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104200D |