VA SJR306 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Constitutional amendment (first resolution); apportionment; Virginia Redistricting Commission. Establishes the Virginia Redistricting Commission, a 16-member Commission tasked with establishing districts for the United States House of Representatives and for the Senate and the House of Delegates of the General Assembly. The Commission consists of eight legislative members and eight citizen members. The legislative members consist of four members of the Senate of Virginia and four members of the House of Delegates, with equal representation given to the political parties having the highest and next highest number of members in their respective houses. The citizen members are selected by a selection committee consisting of five retired judges of the circuit courts of Virginia, from lists submitted to the selection committee by the Speaker of the House of Delegates, the leader in the House of Delegates of the political party having the next highest number of members in the House of Delegates, the President pro tempore of the Senate of Virginia, and the leader in the Senate of the political party having the next highest number of members in the Senate. The Commission is required to submit to the General Assembly plans of districts for the Senate and the House of Delegates of the General Assembly no later than 45 days following the receipt of census data and plans of districts for the United States House of Representatives no later than 60 days following the receipt of census data, or July 1 of that year, whichever occurs later. The measure requires certain vote thresholds for plans, depending on the type of district, in order to be submitted to the General Assembly. No amendments may be made to a plan by the General Assembly or the Governor. The measure requires additional plans to be submitted, or additional time to be given to submit a plan, in certain circumstances, and further provides that districts will be drawn by the Supreme Court of Virginia if such efforts fail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; Virginia Redistricting Commission (first reference).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #3 by Senator Sturtevant rejected (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ306ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (85-Y 13-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference substitute printed 19107724D-S2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Cole, Rush, Leftwich, Krizek
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Barker, Vogel, Cosgrove
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-20SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-19HouseAgreed to by House with substitute (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SJ306
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106689D-H1 (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-19HouseTaken up
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106689D-H1
2019-02-15HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2019-02-04HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-31SenateRead third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenatePrinted as engrossed 19105499D-ES1
2019-01-30SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SJ306ES1
2019-01-30SenateAmendment #3 by Senator Sturtevant rejected (17-Y 23-N)
2019-01-30SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-30SenateAmendments #1 and #2 by Senator Sturtevant withdrawn
2019-01-30SenateAmendment by Senator Howell agreed to
2019-01-30SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105499D-S1
2019-01-30SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-30SenateRead second time
2019-01-28SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-25SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-24SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105499D-S1
2019-01-22SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104200D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SJ306
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SJ306+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SJ306S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SJ306ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SJ306H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SJ306S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SJ306ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0071+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0173SJ0306+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0250SJ0306+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0269SJ0306+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1804V0012+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0100+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3089+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3090+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0887SJ0306+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0985SJ0306+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3356+SJ0306
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1116SJ0306+SJ0306

Bill Comments

feedback