VA SJR30 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ30ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ30ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Aviation; coordination of the aviation industry for economic and workforce development; report. Requests the Department of Aviation to study the coordination of stakeholders within the aviation industry for economic and workforce development. In conducting its study, the Department shall convene a work group with representation from the aviation industry, the Department of Education, the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, and other interested parties to explore issues related to the continued development of the aviation industry and workforce, in coordination with the Federal Aviation Administration and other responsible federal agencies.
Title
Economic and workforce development; DOAV to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 2-N) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ30ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (92-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101048D |