VA SJR3 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR3

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Constitutional amendment (first resolution); marriage. Proposes the repeal of the constitutional amendment dealing with marriage that was approved by referendum at the November 2006 election. That amendment to the Bill of Rights (i) defines marriage as "only a union between one man and one woman"; (ii) prohibits the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions from creating or recognizing "a legal status for relationships of unmarried individuals that intends to approximate the design, qualities, significance, or effects of marriage"; and (iii) prohibits the Commonwealth or its political subdivisions from creating or recognizing "another union, partnership, or other legal status to which is assigned the rights, benefits, obligations, qualities, or effects of marriage." The provisions of this section of the Constitution of Virginia are no longer valid as a result of the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. ___ (June 26, 2015).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; marriage (first reference).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04SenateLeft in Privileges and Elections
2020-01-21SenateContinued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100590D

Same As/Similar To

SJR3 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback