VA SJR299 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
World Prematurity Day. Designates November 17, in 2019 and in each succeeding year, as World Prematurity Day in Virginia.
Title
Designating as November 17, 2019, and each succeeding year, as World Prematurity Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (88-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 9-N) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 9-N) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2019-02-24 | Senate | No further action taken |
2019-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (88-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Agreed to by House with amendments (88-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Agreed to by House with amendments (90-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Amendment #2 by Delegate Byron agreed to (89-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Pending question ordered |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Amendment #1 by Delegate Byron agreed to (95-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-22 | House | Taken up |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102377D |