VA SJR298 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ298ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ298ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments; June 1. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor Ralph Northam and communicated to the General Assembly June 1, 2020.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To #2 (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ298ER) |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To #2 (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21100075D |