VA SJR293 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR293
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Joint Commission on Health Care; assisted living and auxiliary grants; report. Requests the Joint Commission on Health Care to study available data regarding assisted living and auxiliary grants and develop a blueprint for implementing recommendations that will allow the Commonwealth to provide a more realistic system of addressing housing and care needs. Study; Joint Commission on Health Care; assisted living and auxiliary grants; report. Requests the Joint Commission on Health Care to study available data regarding assisted living and auxiliary grants and develop a blueprint for implementing recommendations that will allow the Commonwealth to provide a more realistic system of addressing housing and care needs.
Title
Assisted living and auxiliary grants; Joint Commission on Health Care to study available data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102328D-E |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ293E |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102328D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR293 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote