VA SJR293 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ293ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ293ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments; June 1 and June 13. Confirms appointments of agency heads and certain persons made by Governor Ralph Northam and communicated to the General Assembly June 1, 2018, and June 13, 2018.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ293ER) |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Taken up |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100040D |