VA SJR290 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Rejected by Senate (19-Y 19-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Rejected by Senate (19-Y 19-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first reference); legislative compensation; Legislative Compensation Commission. Establishes the Legislative Compensation Commission, charged with determining the salaries, allowances, and retirement benefits of the members of the General Assembly. Members would receive no compensation from the Commonwealth other than the compensation determined by the Commission. The Commission is established by appointment of the General Assembly every four years beginning July 1, 2026.
Title
Constitutional amendment; legislative compensation, Legislative Compensation Commission established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Rejected by Senate (19-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N 5-A) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N 5-A) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Rejected by Senate (19-Y 19-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102496D-E |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ290E |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Amendments by Senator McPike agreed to |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 0-N 5-A) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102496D |