VA SJR289 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ289ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ289ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Awareness Day. Designates February 20, in 2019 and in each succeeding year, as Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Awareness Day in Virginia.
Title
Designating Feb. 20, 2019 and each succeeding year, as Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ289ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Taken up |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101353D |