VA SJR285 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ285ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ285ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Douglas William Rogers.
Title
Celebrating the life of Douglas William Rogers.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] |
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ285ER) |
2023-01-30 | House | Agreed to by House |
2023-01-27 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2023-01-27 | House | Received |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Presented 23104894D |