VA SJR285 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Joint Commission on Health Care; sustainability of the Prescription Monitoring Program; report. Directs the Joint Commission on Health Care to study the sustainability of the Prescription Monitoring Program and identify potential funding sources for its future operation.
Title
Study; Joint Commission on Health Care; sustainability of the Prescription Monitoring Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17102142D-E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ285E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102142D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Narcotics and Drugs
Prescription Medicines
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Narcotics and Drugs
Prescription Medicines
Study Commissions Committees and Reports