VA SJR284 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-18 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ284ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of the Honorable Augustus Benton Chafin, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of the Honorable Augustus Benton Chafin, Jr.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ284ER)
2021-01-18HouseAgreed to by House
2021-01-14HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2021-01-14HouseReceived
2021-01-13SenateAgreed to by Senate
2021-01-13SenateEngrossed by Senate
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/13/21 21102604D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback