VA SJR284 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); Virginia Redistricting Commission. Establishes the Virginia Redistricting Commission which will conduct the decennial reapportionment of the election districts for the House of Representatives and the General Assembly. The amendment also establishes the criteria and process to be used for each decennial reapportionment.
Title
Constitutional amendment; Virginia Redistricting Commission established.
Sponsors
Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-16 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ284S1 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104051D-S1 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Incorporates SJ224 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104051D-S1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100750D |
Same As/Similar To
SJ224 (Similar To) 2015-01-20 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections