VA SJR282 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ282ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ282ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Substance-Exposed Infant Awareness Week. Designates the first week of July, in 2017 and in each succeeding year, as Substance-Exposed Infant Awareness Week in Virginia.
Title
Substance-Exposed Infant Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] |
Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. Jennifer Wexton [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ282ER) |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Taken up |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102433D |