VA SJR278 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Constitutional amendment (first resolution); personal property tax exemption; motor vehicle of a veteran who is disabled. Provides that one motor vehicle of a veteran who has a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability shall be exempt from state and local taxes. The amendment provides that only automobiles and pickup trucks qualify for the exemption. Additionally, the exemption is only applicable on the date the motor vehicle is acquired or the effective date of the amendment, whichever is later, and is not applicable for any period of time prior to the effective date of the amendment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; personal property tax exemption for motor vehicle of a disabled veteran.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
2019-03-26HouseAssigned Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ278ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 3-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N)
2019-02-22HouseReconsideration of conference report agreed to by House
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Filler-Corn, Rush, O'Quinn
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Reeves, DeSteph, Spruill
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-20SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-19HouseAgreed to by House with substitute (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SJ278H1
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106687D-H1
2019-02-19HouseTaken up
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106687D-H1
2019-02-15HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateAgreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateRead third time
2019-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ278S1
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105271D-S1
2019-01-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-25SenateRead second time
2019-01-24SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105271D-S1
2019-01-22SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-11SenatePresented and ordered printed 19101842D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SJ278
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SJ278+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SJ278S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SJ278H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SJ278ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0823+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0074+SJ0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0173SJ0278+SJ0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0217SJ0278+SJ0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1804V0010+SJ0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0099+SJ0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3088+SJ0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0886SJ0278+SJ0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0985SJ0278+SJ0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3283+SJ0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3284+SJ0278
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1032SJ0278+SJ0278

Bill Comments

feedback