VA SJR277 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-18 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ277ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-18 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ277ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Marymount University.
Title
Commending Marymount University.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ277ER) |
2021-01-18 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2021-01-15 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2021-01-15 | House | Received |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/13/21 21100676D |