VA SJR271 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ271ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Confirming Governor's appointments; January 1. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor Glenn Youngkin and communicated to the General Assembly January 1, 2023. Confirming Governor's appointments; January 1. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor Glenn Youngkin and communicated to the General Assembly January 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governor; confirming appointments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment agreed to (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-09SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ271ER)
2023-02-09HouseVOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-09HouseAgreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-09HouseTaken up
2023-02-08HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
2023-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2023-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-02-07SenateAgreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-07SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-07SenatePrinted as engrossed 23104555D-E
2023-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SJ271E
2023-02-07SenateCommittee amendment agreed to (23-Y 17-N)
2023-02-07SenateReading of amendment waived
2023-02-07SenateRead second time
2023-02-06SenatePassed by for the day
2023-02-03SenatePassed by for the day
2023-02-02SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2023-01-31SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2023-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2023-01-20SenatePresented and ordered printed 23104555D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+SJ271
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SJ271+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SJ271E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+SJ271ER+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+SJ271AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23106069A.pdf
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S08V0048+SJ0271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0213SJ0271+SJ0271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0383SJ0271+SJ0271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0384SJ0271+SJ0271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0385SJ0271+SJ0271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H18V0064+SJ0271
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1727+SJ0271

Bill Comments

feedback