VA SJR270 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR270
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first reference); marriage; repeal of same-sex marriage prohibition; affirmative right to marry. Repeals the constitutional provision defining marriage as only a union between one man and one woman as well as the related provisions that are no longer valid as a result of the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. 644 (2015). The amendment provides that the right to marry is a fundamental right inherent in the liberty of persons and requires the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions and agents to issue marriage licenses, recognize marriages, and treat all marriages equally under the law, regardless of the sex or gender of the parties to the marriage. Religious organizations and clergy acting in their religious capacity have the right to refuse to perform any marriage. Constitutional amendment (first reference); marriage; repeal of same-sex marriage prohibition; affirmative right to marry. Repeals the constitutional provision defining marriage as only a union between one man and one woman as well as the related provisions that are no longer valid as a result of the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. 644 (2015). The amendment provides that the right to marry is a fundamental right inherent in the liberty of persons and requires the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions and agents to issue marriage licenses, recognize marriages, and treat all marriages equally under the law, regardless of the sex or gender of the parties to the marriage. Religious organizations and clergy acting in their religious capacity have the right to refuse to perform any marriage.
Title
Constitutional amendment; marriage (first reference).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (24-Y 12-N) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute agreed to (19-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute agreed to (19-Y 19-N) (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (24-Y 12-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Title replaced 21100733D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ270S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Chair votes Yea |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to (19-Y 19-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21100733D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A) |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100202D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR270 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote