VA SJR27 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ27ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ27ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; continuing the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Flooding; report. Continues the Joint Subcommittee on Coastal Flooding for two additional years, through the 2021 interim.
Title
Coastal Flooding, Joint Subcommittee on; continued, appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (92-Y 2-N) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ27ER) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (92-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Agreed to by House (92-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Taken up |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104185D |
Same As/Similar To
HJ102 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ102ER)