VA SJR267 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - Agreed to by House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Evelyn Marie Kerr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Evelyn Marie Kerr.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14HouseAgreed to by House
2019-01-11HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2019-01-11HouseReceived
2019-01-10SenateAgreed to by Senate
2019-01-10SenateEngrossed by Senate
2018-12-14SenatePrefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/09/19 19101486D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback