VA SJR267 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ267ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ267ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Alan Schuman.
Title
Commending Alan Schuman.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ267ER) |
2017-01-20 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2017-01-13 | House | Received |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/11/17 17100075D |