VA SJR257 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-16 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ257ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Honorable Glenn L. Clayton II.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Honorable Glenn L. Clayton II.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-16SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ257ER)
2023-01-16HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2023-01-13HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2023-01-13HouseReceived
2023-01-12SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2023-01-12SenateEngrossed by Senate
2023-01-10SenatePrefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/11/23 23100724D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback