VA SJR250 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - Rejected by Senate (18-Y 22-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - Rejected by Senate (18-Y 22-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); Governor's term of office. Permits a Governor elected in 2021 and thereafter to succeed himself in office. The amendment allows two four-year terms (either in succession or not in succession) but prohibits election to a third term. Service for more than two years of a partial term counts as service for one term.
Title
Constitutional amendment; Governor's term of office (first reference).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Rejected by Senate (18-Y 22-N) (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | Senate | Rejected by Senate (18-Y 22-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-07-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100113D |