VA SJR244 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ244ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Ashburn Ice House.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Ashburn Ice House.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ244ER)
2020-03-07HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2020-03-05HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2020-03-05HouseReceived
2020-03-04SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2020-03-04SenateEngrossed by Senate
2020-03-02SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2020-03-02SenatePresented 20109210D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback