VA SJR24 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-19 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ24ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Virginia Dual Language Educators Network.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Virginia Dual Language Educators Network.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ24ER)
2018-01-19HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2018-01-12HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2018-01-12HouseReceived
2018-01-11SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2018-01-11SenateEngrossed by Senate
2018-01-04SenatePrefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/10/18 18103584D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback