VA SJR226 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first reference); local government; sale of property; authority to grant perpetual easements to units of government. Allows easements on public property to be granted in perpetuity to a public body, political subdivision, or authority of the Commonwealth or to the United States or any of its departments or agencies. The requirement to advertise and publicly receive bids does not apply to easements conveyed to any such governmental entity.
Title
Constitutional amendment; local government, sale of property.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Left in Rules |
2023-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Amendments and Other Matters Subcommittee |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (22-Y 15-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101114D |