VA SJR209 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ209ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ209ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Town of Luray.
Title
Commending the Town of Luray.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ209ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-03-06 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2012-03-06 | House: Received | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Taken up for immediate consideration | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 12105067D | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Presented 12105067D |